Home > TD Bank USA > History
TD Bank USA, History
The following are major historical events for TD Bank USA, including mergers and acquisitions.
1994-10-13 | Institution established: Original name:Waterhouse National Bank | |
1996-09-06 | Changed organization type to CREDIT CARD BANK | |
1997-12-15 | Moved bank headquarters from WHITE PLAINS, NY to JERSEY CITY, NJ | |
1999-09-20 | Changed name to TD Waterhouse Bank, National Association | |
2006-04-07 | Moved bank headquarters from JERSEY CITY, NJ to NEW YORK, NY | |
2006-04-24 | Changed name to TD Bank USA, National Association | |
2007-09-30 | Moved bank headquarters from NEW YORK, NY to PORTLAND, ME | |
2007-09-30 | Reorganized. | |
2013-03-13 | Moved bank headquarters from PORTLAND, ME to WILMINGTON, DE |