Home > International Bank of Commerce > History
International Bank of Commerce, History
The following are major historical events for International Bank of Commerce, including mergers and acquisitions.
1966-09-02 | Institution established: Original name:Bank of Commerce of Laredo | |
1989-05-01 | Acquired International Bank of Commerce, National Association, San An (24892) in SAN ANTONIO, TX | |
1989-05-01 | Changed name to International Bank of Commerce | |
1990-06-29 | Acquired Valley Federal Savings Association (32823) in MCALLEN, TX | |
1991-06-21 | Acquired Travis Federal Savings and Loan Association (33090) in SAN ANTONIO, TX | |
1992-06-25 | Acquired Castle Hills National Bank (25063) in SAN ANTONIO, TX | |
1994-09-01 | Acquired First State Bank and Trust Company (11940) in PORT LAVACA, TX | |
1995-01-31 | Acquired Bank of Corpus Christi (24475) in CORPUS CHRISTI, TX | |
1995-09-08 | Acquired Stone Oak National Bank (24549) in SAN ANTONIO, TX | |
1997-11-06 | Acquired University Bank (15885) in HOUSTON, TX | |
2001-12-28 | Acquired NBC Bank, National Association (3180) in EAGLE PASS, TX | |
2004-06-19 | Acquired Local Oklahoma Bank (28542) in OKLAHOMA CITY, OK | |
2007-03-16 | Acquired Commercial State Bank (1217) in SINTON, TX |