Home > Wellington State Bank > History
Wellington State Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Wellington State Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1906-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Wellington State Bank | |
1992-11-30 | Reorganized. | |
1994-07-30 | Acquired First National Bank in Wheeler (16901) in WHEELER, TX | |
2016-02-20 | Acquired Security State Bank (16631) in LITTLEFIELD, TX | |
2016-10-29 | Acquired First National Bank in Dalhart (14508) in DALHART, TX | |
2019-11-12 | Acquired The First National Bank of Paducah (3377) in PADUCAH, TX |