Home > Truist Bank > History
Truist Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Truist Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1872-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Branch Banking & Trust Company | |
1970-12-31 | Acquired Bank of Statesville (11511) in STATESVILLE, NC | |
1974-07-01 | Changed name to Branch Banking and Trust Company | |
1976-06-30 | Acquired The Bank of Matthews (8920) in MATTHEWS, NC | |
1976-12-20 | Acquired The Citizens Bank of Warrenton (8628) in WARRENTON, NC | |
1980-10-20 | Acquired Edgecombe Bank & Trust Company (15875) in TARBORO, NC | |
1981-10-05 | Acquired Independence National Bank (4890) in GASTONIA, NC | |
1983-06-04 | Acquired City National Bank (15295) in CHARLOTTE, NC | |
1984-07-02 | Acquired The Carolina Bank (2029) in SANFORD, NC | |
1984-07-02 | Acquired Bank of Alamance (22230) in GRAHAM, NC | |
1991-09-13 | Acquired BB&T Federal Savings Bank of Pitt County (29888) in GREENVILLE, NC | |
1991-09-13 | Acquired BB&T Federal Savings Bank of High Point (28725) in HIGH POINT, NC | |
1991-09-13 | Acquired BB&T Savings Bank of Durham, Inc. (27672) in DURHAM, NC | |
1991-11-16 | Acquired Albemarle Savings and Loan Association (27927) in ELIZABETH CITY, NC | |
1992-04-25 | Acquired Gate City Federal Savings Bank (27787) in GREENSBORO, NC | |
1992-07-20 | Acquired Peoples Federal Savings Bank of Thomasville (28033) in THOMASVILLE, NC | |
1993-03-27 | Acquired First Financial Savings Bank, Inc. (32354) in KINSTON, NC | |
1993-05-17 | Acquired Security Federal Savings Bank (28005) in DURHAM, NC | |
1993-08-17 | Acquired Carolina Savings Bank (27793) in WILMINGTON, NC | |
1993-08-30 | Acquired Edenton Savings and Loan Association (30747) in EDENTON, NC | |
1994-02-12 | Acquired Old Stone Bank of North Carolina, A FSB (30025) in HIGH POINT, NC | |
1994-08-22 | Acquired Citizens Savings Bank, SSB, Inc. (30316) in NEWTON, NC | |
1994-09-09 | Acquired Mutual Savings Bank of Rockingham County, SSB (28028) in REIDSVILLE, NC | |
1994-09-09 | Acquired Citizens Savings Bank, SSB (30098) in MOORESVILLE, NC | |
1995-05-27 | Moved bank headquarters from WILSON, NC to WINSTON-SALEM, NC | |
1995-05-27 | Acquired Southern National Bank of North Carolina (4899) in LUMBERTON, NC | |
1995-05-27 | Acquired SNB Savings Bank, Inc., SSB (32115) in VALDESE, NC | |
1996-09-11 | Moved bank headquarters from WINSTON-SALEM, NC to WINSTON SALEM, NC | |
1997-09-19 | Acquired United Carolina Bank (2026) in WHITEVILLE, NC | |
1998-11-14 | Acquired Maryland Federal Bank (28269) in HYATTSVILLE, MD | |
1999-02-22 | Acquired Franklin National Bank of Washington, D.C. (24658) in WASHINGTON, DC | |
1999-07-16 | Acquired Commerce Bank Corporation (27596) in COLLEGE PARK, MD | |
2000-03-18 | Acquired Bank of Maryland (26477) in TOWSON, MD | |
2000-03-18 | Acquired Carroll County Bank and Trust Company (11797) in WESTMINSTER, MD | |
2000-04-15 | Acquired The Matewan National Bank (6777) in WILLIAMSON, WV | |
2000-04-15 | Acquired Matewan Bank, FSB (33870) in PIKEVILLE, KY | |
2000-05-20 | Acquired First Liberty Bank (29568) in MACON, GA | |
2000-07-15 | Acquired First Citizens Bank (30755) in NEWNAN, GA | |
2000-07-15 | Acquired Premier Bank (26307) in ATLANTA, GA | |
2000-07-15 | Acquired Farmers & Merchants Bank (8481) in SUMMERVILLE, GA | |
2000-07-15 | Acquired Bank Atlanta (27122) in DECATUR, GA | |
2000-07-15 | Acquired First Citizens Bank (33074) in FAYETTEVILLE, GA | |
2000-07-15 | Acquired Milton National Bank (33547) in ROSWELL, GA | |
2000-11-10 | Acquired One Valley Bank - South, Inc. (9027) in SUMMERSVILLE, WV | |
2000-11-10 | Acquired One Valley Bank-East, National Association (6775) in MARTINSBURG, WV | |
2000-11-10 | Acquired One Valley Bank of Mercer County, Inc. (17843) in PRINCETON, WV | |
2000-11-10 | Acquired One Valley Bank, National Association (840) in CHARLESTON, WV | |
2000-11-10 | Acquired One Valley Bank - North, Inc. (14306) in MOUNDSVILLE, WV | |
2000-11-10 | Acquired One Valley Bank of Huntington (17625) in HUNTINGTON, WV | |
2000-11-10 | Acquired One Valley Bank, Inc. (12658) in MORGANTOWN, WV | |
2001-03-16 | Acquired FCNB Bank (4843) in FREDERICK, MD | |
2001-05-12 | Acquired Wayne National Bank (33147) in JESUP, GA | |
2001-05-12 | Acquired Metter Banking Company (15292) in METTER, GA | |
2001-05-12 | Acquired First National Bank of Effingham (32719) in SPRINGFIELD, GA | |
2001-05-12 | Acquired First National Bank of Northwest Georgia (2122) in CALHOUN, GA | |
2001-05-12 | Acquired Hardwick Bank & Trust Company (5714) in DALTON, GA | |
2001-05-12 | Acquired First Bulloch Bank & Trust Company (14215) in STATESBORO, GA | |
2001-07-13 | Acquired BankFirst Trust Company (35158) in KNOXVILLE, TN | |
2001-07-13 | Acquired The First National Bank and Trust Company Athens, Tennessee (4916) in ATHENS, TN | |
2001-07-13 | Acquired BankFirst (4950) in KNOXVILLE, TN | |
2001-11-09 | Acquired Century South Bank of Polk County (33903) in COPPERHILL, TN | |
2001-11-09 | Acquired Century South Bank of Ellijay (5688) in ELLIJAY, GA | |
2001-11-09 | Acquired Century South Bank of Dawsonville (33369) in DAWSONVILLE, GA | |
2001-11-09 | Acquired Century South Bank of Lavonia (27345) in LAVONIA, GA | |
2001-11-09 | Acquired Century South Bank of the Carolinas (30327) in WAYNESVILLE, NC | |
2001-11-09 | Acquired Century South Bank of Danielsville (5684) in DANIELSVILLE, GA | |
2001-11-09 | Acquired Century South Bank of Alabama (27365) in OXFORD, AL | |
2001-11-09 | Acquired Century South Bank of Dahlonega (5683) in DAHLONEGA, GA | |
2001-11-09 | Acquired Century South Bank of Northeast Georgia, National Association (26503) in GAINESVILLE, GA | |
2001-11-09 | Acquired Century South Bank of the Coastal Region, National Association (26213) in SAVANNAH, GA | |
2001-11-09 | Acquired Century South Bank of Fannin County, National Association (4927) in BLUE RIDGE, GA | |
2001-11-09 | Acquired Century South Bank of Central Georgia, National Association (33733) in MACON, GA | |
2002-03-16 | Acquired F&M Bank - Maryland, Inc. (26984) in BETHESDA, MD | |
2002-03-16 | Acquired F & M Bank-West Virginia, Inc. (16804) in RANSON, WV | |
2002-05-11 | Acquired Community First Bank (27887) in CARROLLTON, GA | |
2002-07-12 | Acquired Area Trust Company (14876) in OWENSBORO, KY | |
2002-07-12 | Acquired The Vine Street Trust Company (27375) in OWENSBORO, KY | |
2002-07-12 | Acquired Area Bank (18478) in OWENSBORO, KY | |
2002-09-13 | Acquired Bank of Louisville (8778) in LOUISVILLE, KY | |
2002-11-08 | Acquired First South Bank (32570) in TALLAHASSEE, FL | |
2003-03-14 | Acquired Equitable Bank (31606) in WHEATON, MD | |
2003-10-11 | Acquired Farmers Bank of Maryland (4821) in ANNAPOLIS, MD | |
2003-10-11 | Acquired Atlantic Bank (21641) in OCEAN CITY, MD | |
2004-06-11 | Acquired Republic Bank (21350) in SAINT PETERSBURG, FL | |
2006-09-16 | Acquired Main Street Bank (9243) in COVINGTON, GA | |
2006-11-11 | Acquired The Home Bank (10303) in DUCKTOWN, TN | |
2006-11-11 | Acquired The Bank/First Citizens Bank (21498) in CLEVELAND, TN | |
2006-11-11 | Acquired The Home Bank of Tennessee (34192) in MARYVILLE, TN | |
2006-12-31 | Acquired Branch Banking and Trust Company of South Carolina (21098) in GREENVILLE, SC | |
2006-12-31 | Acquired Branch Banking and Trust Company of Virginia (22584) in RICHMOND, VA | |
2007-08-18 | Acquired Coastal Federal Bank (30683) in MYRTLE BEACH, SC | |
2008-12-12 | Acquired Haven Trust Bank (35379) in DULUTH, GA as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2009-08-14 | Acquired Colonial Bank (9609) in MONTGOMERY, AL as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2012-08-02 | Acquired BankAtlantic (30559) in FORT LAUDERDALE, FL | |
2013-01-01 | Reorganized. | |
2013-01-01 | Acquired BB&T Financial, FSB (34780) in COLUMBUS, GA | |
2013-05-01 | Reorganized. | |
2015-06-19 | Acquired The Bank of Kentucky, Inc. (33022) in CRESTVIEW HILLS, KY | |
2015-08-01 | Acquired Susquehanna Trust & Investment Company (35359) in LANCASTER, PA | |
2015-08-01 | Acquired Semper Trust Company (33308) in KING OF PRUSSIA, PA | |
2015-08-01 | Acquired Susquehanna Bank (7579) in LITITZ, PA | |
2016-04-01 | Acquired National Penn Bank (7414) in ALLENTOWN, PA | |
2019-12-07 | Moved bank headquarters from WINSTON SALEM, NC to CHARLOTTE, NC | |
2019-12-07 | Changed name to Truist Bank | |
2019-12-07 | Acquired SunTrust Bank (867) in ATLANTA, GA |