Home > Transact Bank > History
Transact Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Transact Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1905-12-11 | Institution established: Original name:The Palisades National Bank | |
2011-10-31 | Changed name to Colorado National Bank | |
2019-04-12 | Reorganized. | |
2019-04-26 | Moved bank headquarters from PALISADE, CO to DENVER, CO | |
2020-03-23 | Changed name to Transact Bank, National Association | |
2023-09-29 | Moved bank headquarters from 707 17th St, DENVER, CO to 700 17th St, DENVER, CO. |