Town Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Town Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1998-07-23 | Institution established: Original name:Delafield State Bank | |
2003-06-27 | Changed name to Town Bank | |
2007-05-22 | Moved bank headquarters from DELAFIELD, WI to HARTLAND, WI | |
2015-01-17 | Acquired Community Bank CBD (34220) in DELAVAN, WI | |
2016-03-31 | Acquired Foundations Bank (57972) in PEWAUKEE, WI | |
2019-10-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2019-10-01 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANK, NATIONAL, MEMBER FRS | |
2019-10-01 | Changed name to Town Bank, National Association |