Home > The First Bank > History
The First Bank, History
The following are major historical events for The First Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1996-08-05 | Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of South Mississippi | |
2004-01-23 | Acquired The First National Bank of the Pine Belt (34961) in LAUREL, MS | |
2004-01-26 | Changed name to The First, A National Banking Association | |
2006-10-01 | Acquired First National Bank of Wiggins (21290) in WIGGINS, MS | |
2013-04-30 | Acquired First National Bank of Baldwin County (57181) in FOLEY, AL | |
2014-07-01 | Acquired Bay Bank (34872) in MOBILE, AL | |
2017-01-01 | Acquired Gulf Coast Community Bank (57564) in PENSACOLA, FL | |
2017-01-01 | Acquired Iberville Bank (8807) in PLAQUEMINE, LA | |
2018-03-01 | Acquired First Community Bank (14720) in CHATOM, AL | |
2018-04-01 | Acquired Sunshine Community Bank (58452) in TALLAHASSEE, FL | |
2018-10-31 | Acquired Farmers & Merchants Bank (11286) in MONTICELLO, FL | |
2019-03-01 | Acquired Florida Parishes Bank (29670) in HAMMOND, LA | |
2019-10-31 | Acquired First Florida Bank (58370) in DESTIN, FL | |
2020-04-03 | Acquired Southwest Georgia Bank (2147) in MOULTRIE, GA |