Home > The Camden National Bank > History
The Camden National Bank, History
The following are major historical events for The Camden National Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1875-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:The Camden National Bank | |
2006-09-30 | Acquired UnitedKingfield Bank (22226) in BANGOR, ME | |
2008-01-03 | Acquired Union Trust Company (9) in ELLSWORTH, ME | |
2015-10-16 | Acquired The Bank of Maine (19686) in PORTLAND, ME | |
2016-12-01 | Acquired Acadia Trust, National Association (33597) in PORTLAND, ME |