Home > STAR Financial Bank > History
STAR Financial Bank, History
The following are major historical events for STAR Financial Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1988-05-02 | Institution established: Original name:Trustcorp Bank, Indianapolis | |
1991-01-31 | Changed name to Star Financial Bank, Indianapolis, Indiana | |
1991-01-31 | Acquired STAR, Financial Bank, Elwood (1820) in ELWOOD, IN | |
1991-01-31 | Acquired First National Bank of Madison County (4337) in ANDERSON, IN | |
1996-05-10 | Changed name to Star Financial Bank, Anderson, Indiana | |
1996-05-10 | Moved bank headquarters from INDIANAPOLIS, IN to ANDERSON, IN | |
1997-11-15 | Acquired Star Financial Bank, Marion (5773) in MARION, IN | |
1997-11-15 | Acquired Star Financial Bank, New Castle, Indiana (8055) in NEW CASTLE, IN | |
1997-11-15 | Acquired Star Financial Bank, Columbia City, Indiana (5780) in COLUMBIA CITY, IN | |
1997-11-24 | Changed name to STAR Financial Bank | |
2003-08-13 | Moved bank headquarters from ANDERSON, IN to FORT WAYNE, IN |