Home > Southside Bank > History
Southside Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Southside Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1960-10-03 | Institution established: Original name:Southside State Bank | |
1987-09-26 | Acquired South Broadway Bank (25256) in TYLER, TX | |
1993-10-04 | Changed name to Southside Bank | |
2008-09-29 | Acquired Fort Worth National Bank (34990) in FORT WORTH, TX | |
2014-12-18 | Acquired OmniAmerican Bank (58050) in FORT WORTH, TX | |
2017-11-30 | Acquired First Bank & Trust East Texas (17233) in DIBOLL, TX |