Home > Signature Bank of Arkansas > History
Signature Bank of Arkansas, History
The following are major historical events for Signature Bank of Arkansas, including mergers and acquisitions.
1933-08-18 | Institution established: Original name:Union State Bank | |
1994-01-03 | Changed name to First Bank of South Arkansas | |
1998-09-08 | Moved bank headquarters from JUNCTION CITY, AR to CAMDEN, AR | |
2005-05-09 | Changed name to Signature Bank of Arkansas | |
2005-05-09 | Moved bank headquarters from CAMDEN, AR to FAYETTEVILLE, AR | |
2006-11-01 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2007-04-09 | Acquired Bank of Brinkley (11245) in BRINKLEY, AR | |
2023-02-24 | Changed Bank Class to SM. | |
2023-02-24 | Changed Primary Federal Regulatory Agency from FED to FED. | |
2023-02-24 | Institution becomes member of the Federal Reserve System. |