Home > Security Bank > History
Security Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Security Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1928-03-06 | Institution established: Original name:The Security National Bank of Laurel | |
1991-04-01 | Acquired Security State Bank (16399) in ALLEN, NE | |
1998-11-02 | Acquired Osmond State Bank (16128) in OSMOND, NE | |
2005-07-23 | Acquired The Coleridge National Bank (5392) in COLERIDGE, NE | |
2012-06-25 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2012-06-25 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2012-06-25 | Changed name to Security Bank |