Home > Planters Bank & Trust Company > History
Planters Bank & Trust Company, History
The following are major historical events for Planters Bank & Trust Company, including mergers and acquisitions.
1920-04-10 | Institution established: Original name:Planters Bank & Trust Company | |
1986-03-01 | Moved bank headquarters from RULEVILLE, MS to INDIANOLA, MS | |
2008-12-06 | Acquired Cleveland Community Bank, S.S.B. (27995) in CLEVELAND, MS | |
2016-02-01 | Acquired Covenant Bank (57039) in CLARKSDALE, MS | |
2021-12-18 | Acquired First Capital BankPlanters Bank & Trust Company (57552) in GERMANTOWN, TN. |