Home > PlainsCapital Bank > History
PlainsCapital Bank, History
The following are major historical events for PlainsCapital Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1955-09-15 | Institution established: Original name:The Plains National Bank of Lubbock | |
1994-09-01 | Changed name to The Plains National Bank of West Texas | |
1998-11-18 | Changed name to Plains National Bank | |
1999-09-01 | Changed name to PNB Financial Bank | |
1999-09-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2001-01-02 | Acquired City National Bank (34414) in AUSTIN, TX | |
2003-03-01 | Acquired Whisperwood National Bank (24391) in LUBBOCK, TX | |
2003-10-06 | Changed name to PlainsCapital Bank | |
2011-04-01 | Moved bank headquarters from LUBBOCK, TX to DALLAS, TX | |
2013-09-13 | Acquired First National Bank (14318) in EDINBURG, TX as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2015-01-01 | Acquired Southwest Securities , FSB (32460) in DALLAS, TX | |
2018-08-01 | Acquired The Bank of River Oaks (58142) in HOUSTON, TX | |
2020-04-08 | Moved bank headquarters from DALLAS, TX to University Park, TX |