Home > Pinnacle Bank > History
Pinnacle Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Pinnacle Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1934-03-12 | Institution established: Original name:First National Bank in Elberton | |
1984-12-31 | Acquired The American Bank (19658) in BOWMAN, GA | |
1998-01-01 | Acquired Pinnacle Bank (15846) in ROYSTON, GA | |
1998-01-01 | Changed name to Pinnacle Bank, National Association | |
2001-11-13 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2001-11-13 | Changed name to Pinnacle Bank | |
2001-11-13 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2007-08-01 | Acquired Georgia Central Bank (5708) in SOCIAL CIRCLE, GA | |
2016-11-11 | Acquired Independence Bank of Georgia (58736) in BRASELTON, GA | |
2020-04-01 | Acquired Southern Bank & Trust (58143) in CLARKESVILLE, GA | |
2021-10-01 | Acquired Liberty First BankPinnacle Bank (58274) in MONROE, GA. |