Home > PennCrest Bank > History
PennCrest Bank, History
The following are major historical events for PennCrest Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1939-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Columbia Savings and Loan Association | |
1990-07-31 | Changed name to C&G Savings Association | |
1990-07-31 | Acquired Gallitzin Savings and Loan Association (30328) in GALLITZIN, PA | |
1992-06-29 | Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK | |
1992-06-29 | Changed name to C&G Savings Bank | |
2000-05-31 | Acquired Peoples Savings & Loan Association (57062) in NANTY GLO, PA | |
2016-02-29 | Changed name to PennCrest Bank | |
2016-02-29 | Acquired Cresson Community Bank (28134) in CRESSON, PA |