Home > Northwest Bank > History
Northwest Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Northwest Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1896-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Northwest Mutual Savings Association | |
1983-04-30 | Acquired Ridgway Federal Savings and Loan Association (28874) in RIDGWAY, PA | |
1984-01-31 | Acquired Mutual Savings and Loan Association (27761) in ERIE, PA | |
1985-09-30 | Acquired Bakerstown Savings and Loan Association (27919) in VALENCIA, PA | |
1990-04-02 | Acquired Horizon Savings Association (28121) in LEWISTOWN, PA | |
1990-06-04 | Acquired Steitz Savings and Loan Association (30673) in LEBANON, PA | |
1992-03-07 | Acquired American Federal Saving (30235) in FRANKLIN, PA | |
1993-09-10 | Changed name to Northwest Savings Bank | |
1993-09-10 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
1993-09-10 | Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK | |
1994-11-04 | Changed from the Savings Association Insurance Fund to the Bank Insurance Fund. | |
1994-11-04 | Reorganized. | |
1994-11-04 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
1996-03-30 | Acquired First Federal Savings Bank of Kane (29859) in KANE, PA | |
1996-04-12 | Acquired The First National Bank of Centre Hall (7430) in CENTRE HALL, PA | |
1997-02-21 | Acquired Bridgeville Savings Bank, F.S.B. (28772) in BRIDGEVILLE, PA | |
1998-02-17 | Reorganized. | |
1998-10-21 | Acquired Corry Savings Bank (29923) in CORRY, PA | |
1999-01-22 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2001-04-27 | Acquired Heritage Trust Company (33747) in ERIE, PA | |
2002-09-13 | Acquired Prestige Bank, A Federal Savings Bank (29455) in PITTSBURGH, PA | |
2003-10-20 | Acquired Bell Federal Savings and Loan Association (28421) in BELLEVUE, PA | |
2004-09-10 | Acquired Leeds Federal Savings Bank (28270) in BALTIMORE, MD | |
2004-11-12 | Acquired First Carnegie Deposit (27706) in CARNEGIE, PA | |
2005-05-20 | Acquired Jamestown Savings Bank (34088) in LAKEWOOD, NY | |
2005-10-21 | Acquired Equinox Bank, FSB (34871) in PEMBROKE PINES, FL | |
2006-05-19 | Acquired Maryland Permanent Bank & Trust Company (27555) in OWINGS MILLS, MD | |
2007-06-22 | Acquired CSB Bank (15921) in CURWENSVILLE, PA | |
2009-10-23 | Acquired Keystone State Savings Bank (28416) in SHARPSBURG, PA | |
2015-01-29 | Changed name to Northwest Bank | |
2015-08-14 | Acquired The Lorain National Bank (14832) in LORAIN, OH | |
2019-03-08 | Acquired Union Community Bank (35257) in MOUNT JOY, PA | |
2020-04-24 | Acquired MutualBank (27744) in MUNCIE, IN |