Home > Legacy Bank & Trust Company > History
Legacy Bank & Trust Company, History
The following are major historical events for Legacy Bank & Trust Company, including mergers and acquisitions.
1907-10-17 | Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Bank of Plato (90327) | |
1976-08-17 | Became FDIC insured. | |
1976-08-17 | FDIC certificate number changed from (90327) to | |
2003-05-09 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2003-05-09 | Changed primary regulatory agency from STATE to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2003-06-23 | Changed name to Legacy Bank & Trust Company | |
2005-03-26 | Acquired The Citizens Bank of Sparta (12459) in SPARTA, MO | |
2009-01-20 | Moved bank headquarters from PLATO, MO to ROGERSVILLE, MO | |
2018-02-17 | Acquired First National Bank of Clinton (16347) in CLINTON, MO |