Home > Gateway First Bank > History
Gateway First Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Gateway First Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1935-03-02 | Institution established: Original name:Farmers Exchange Bank | |
1996-08-01 | Acquired The Service Bank of Tonkawa (19860) in TONKAWA, OK | |
2016-02-26 | Acquired The First National Bank of Nash (4155) in NASH, OK | |
2019-05-03 | Changed name to Gateway First Bank | |
2019-05-03 | Reorganized. | |
2019-05-03 | Moved bank headquarters from CHEROKEE, OK to JENKS, OK | |
2021-01-06 | Moved bank headquarters from 244 SOUTH GATEWAY PLACE, JENKS, OK to 244 South Gateway Place, Jenks, OK. |