Home > Franklin Savings Bank > History
Franklin Savings Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Franklin Savings Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1868-11-16 | Institution established: Original name:Franklin Savings Bank | |
1970-03-30 | Changed name to Franklin County Savings Bank | |
1976-11-05 | Changed name to Franklin Savings Bank | |
1998-01-27 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
1998-01-27 | Reorganized. | |
2003-01-22 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2003-01-22 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
2003-01-22 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD |