Home > FNBC Bank & Trust > History
FNBC Bank & Trust, History
The following are major historical events for FNBC Bank & Trust, including mergers and acquisitions.
1908-08-17 | Institution established: Original name:West Chicago State Bank | |
1993-01-28 | Reorganized. | |
1996-03-01 | Changed name to State Bank of Illinois | |
2000-05-08 | Acquired Mokena State Bank (10457) in MOKENA, IL | |
2001-12-17 | Acquired Foxdale Bank (34035) in SOUTH ELGIN, IL | |
2014-12-31 | Changed name to FNBC Bank & Trust | |
2014-12-31 | Moved bank headquarters from WEST CHICAGO, IL to LA GRANGE, IL | |
2014-12-31 | Acquired First National Bank of La Grange (13682) in LA GRANGE, IL |