Home > First State Bank > History
First State Bank, History
The following are major historical events for First State Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1905-12-01 | Institution established: Original name:The First State Bank | |
1985-09-13 | Changed name to The First State Bank of Gainesville | |
1985-09-13 | Reorganized. | |
1996-07-01 | Acquired North Texas Bank and Trust (24428) in GAINESVILLE, TX | |
2002-08-14 | Changed name to First State Bank | |
2013-12-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2013-12-21 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2015-01-31 | Acquired North Texas Bank, National Association (57817) in DECATUR, TX |