Home > First Service Bank > History
First Service Bank, History
The following are major historical events for First Service Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1962-05-07 | Institution established: Original name:First National Bank of Dermott | |
1976-10-15 | Changed name to First State Bank of Dermott | |
1994-01-25 | Changed name to First Community Bank of S.E. Arkansas | |
1998-04-16 | Changed name to First Service Bank of Greenbrier | |
1999-01-04 | Moved bank headquarters from DERMOTT, AR to GREENBRIER, AR | |
1999-07-20 | Changed name to First Service Bank |