Home > First Security Bank and Trust Company > History
First Security Bank and Trust Company, History
The following are major historical events for First Security Bank and Trust Company, including mergers and acquisitions.
1903-07-14 | Institution established: Original name:First Security Bank & Trust Company | |
1971-01-01 | Changed name to First Security Bank and Trust Company | |
1987-03-04 | Acquired The First State Bank (9101) in ROCKFORD, IA | |
1988-01-20 | Acquired Aredale State Bank (14376) in AREDALE, IA | |
2009-11-07 | Acquired First State Bank (4498) in RICEVILLE, IA | |
2009-11-07 | Acquired First State Bank (8093) in NORA SPRINGS, IA | |
2015-12-07 | Acquired Hampton State Bank (13722) in HAMPTON, IA |