Home > First National Bank > History
First National Bank, History
The following are major historical events for First National Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1934-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:First National Bank in Pierre | |
1983-11-11 | Acquired Miners and Merchants Bank (9945) in LEAD, SD | |
1985-01-01 | Acquired The Frontier Bank (6067) in MURDO, SD | |
1985-05-01 | Changed name to First National Bank | |
1989-10-01 | Acquired First State Bank of McLaughlin (9948) in MCLAUGHLIN, SD | |
1992-12-05 | Acquired Security Bank of South Dakota, National Association (3984) in FORT PIERRE, SD | |
2000-01-24 | Moved bank headquarters from PIERRE, SD to FORT PIERRE, SD | |
2003-09-01 | Acquired Arapahoe Bank and Trust (21001) in ENGLEWOOD, CO | |
2019-08-05 | Acquired Advantage Bank (57072) in LOVELAND, CO |