Home > First Federal Savings Bank of Kentucky > History
First Federal Savings Bank of Kentucky, History
The following are major historical events for First Federal Savings Bank of Kentucky, including mergers and acquisitions.
1934-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:First Federal Savings and Loan Association | |
1989-08-31 | Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK | |
1989-08-31 | Changed name to First Federal Savings Bank of Frankfort | |
1995-07-07 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2013-01-01 | Acquired Central Kentucky Federal Savings Bank (31156) in DANVILLE, KY | |
2015-12-09 | Changed name to First Federal Savings Bank of Kentucky |