Home > Farmers Bank of Northern Missouri > History
Farmers Bank of Northern Missouri, History
The following are major historical events for Farmers Bank of Northern Missouri, including mergers and acquisitions.
1901-06-01 | Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of Gallatin | |
1997-07-28 | Reorganized. | |
2000-12-04 | Acquired Farmers Bank of Northern Missouri, National Association (13587) in CENTERVILLE, IA | |
2000-12-04 | Moved bank headquarters from GALLATIN, MO to UNIONVILLE, MO | |
2000-12-04 | Changed name to Farmers Bank of Northern Missouri, National Association | |
2011-06-24 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2011-06-24 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2011-06-24 | Changed name to Farmers Bank of Northern Missouri | |
2016-01-30 | Acquired Flowers National Bank (4527) in CAINSVILLE, MO |