Home > Cleo State Bank > History
Cleo State Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Cleo State Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1900-10-25 | Institution established: Original name:Cleo State Bank, Cleo Springs | |
1947-01-27 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
1947-01-27 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
1947-08-12 | Changed name to Cleo State Bank | |
1969-10-10 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
1969-10-10 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
1985-10-18 | Acquired First State Bank (14670) in JET, OK | |
1989-05-01 | Acquired The First National Bank in Carmen (4053) in CARMEN, OK |