Home > Citizens and Farmers Bank > History
Citizens and Farmers Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Citizens and Farmers Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1927-02-01 | Institution established: Original name:Citizens and Farmers Bank | |
1979-09-21 | Acquired The Colonial Bank (20497) in PROVIDENCE FORGE, VA | |
1994-03-07 | Reorganized. | |
2014-03-22 | Acquired Central Virginia Bank (21225) in POWHATAN, VA | |
2020-01-01 | Acquired Peoples Community Bank (829) in MONTROSS, VA |