CFBank, History
The following are major historical events for CFBank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1892-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Central Federal Savings and Loan Association | |
1998-12-31 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS & LOAN | |
2003-03-27 | Changed name to Central Federal Bank | |
2004-04-20 | Moved bank headquarters from WELLSVILLE, OH to FAIRLAWN, OH | |
2004-04-20 | Changed name to CFBank | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2016-12-01 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK | |
2016-12-01 | Moved bank headquarters from FAIRLAWN, OH to WORTHINGTON, OH | |
2016-12-01 | Changed name to Cf Bank, National Association | |
2016-12-01 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANK, NATIONAL, MEMBER FRS |