Home > American Bank > History
American Bank, History
The following are major historical events for American Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1970-07-27 | Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Western State Bank (90495) | |
1970-11-25 | FDIC certificate number changed from (90495) to | |
1970-11-25 | Became FDIC insured. | |
1983-11-15 | Changed name to American Bank of Billings | |
1992-10-31 | Changed name to American Bank | |
1992-10-31 | Acquired First Security Bank of Big Timber (21143) in BIG TIMBER, MT | |
1992-10-31 | Acquired First Security Bank of Livingston (16618) in LIVINGSTON, MT | |
1992-10-31 | Acquired InterWest Bank of Montana (20409) in BOZEMAN, MT | |
1997-12-06 | Moved bank headquarters from BILLINGS, MT to BOZEMAN, MT | |
1997-12-06 | Changed name to American Bank of Montana | |
1998-04-27 | Acquired American Bank (Whitefish) (34063) in WHITEFISH, MT | |
2004-09-20 | Changed name to American Bank | |
2016-09-15 | Changed primary regulatory agency from STATE to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2016-09-15 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS |