Home > Amarillo National Bank > History
Amarillo National Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Amarillo National Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1892-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Amarillo National Bank | |
1986-12-04 | Acquired Panhandle Bank & Trust Company (15371) in BORGER, TX | |
1991-06-28 | Acquired First Federal Savings Association (33048) in BORGER, TX as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
1991-08-16 | Acquired Citizens Security Bank, F.A. (33355) in BORGER, TX | |
1993-06-10 | Acquired BancCentral (17963) in AMARILLO, TX | |
2010-05-01 | Reorganized. | |
2019-03-04 | Acquired Lubbock National Bank (22752) in LUBBOCK, TX |